Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Justesen | 01.05.2008 | 11.01.2011 | direktion |
Svend Aage Johansen | 31.05.2007 | 02.12.2008 | direktion |
Per Robert Topp Eliasen | 07.02.2000 | 01.05.2008 | direktion |
Christian Westy Beckett | 07.02.2000 | 31.12.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Svend Aage Johansen | 01.10.2004 | 31.05.2007 | bestyrelse |
Richard Sofsrud Schmidt | 05.11.2001 | 31.05.2007 | bestyrelse |
Per Robert Topp Eliasen | 07.02.2000 | 31.05.2007 | bestyrelse |
Christian Westy Beckett | 07.02.2000 | 31.05.2007 | bestyrelse |
Erik Justesen | 07.02.2000 | 31.05.2007 | formand |
Frank Knudsen | 07.02.2000 | 28.05.2004 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Levin Aamand | 07.02.2000 | 30.05.2002 | bestyrelse |