Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Martin Thomas Kruse-Madsen | 29.08.2005 | 17.01.2014 | bestyrelse |
Claudia Alexandra Kruse-Madsen | 29.08.2005 | 17.01.2014 | bestyrelse |
Claus Axel Kruse-Madsen | 29.08.2005 | 20.10.2010 | bestyrelse |
Hans Carl Ramon Schou | 25.11.1964 | 17.01.2014 | bestyrelse |
Claus Axel Kruse-Madsen | 25.11.1964 | 29.08.2005 | suppleant |