Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Kragholm | 22.04.2003 | 30.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Gustav Borup Søndergaard | 22.04.2003 | 30.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Bent Soling | 22.04.2003 | 30.09.2004 | formand |
Henrik Lars Olsen | 02.12.2002 | 22.04.2003 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Pedersen Rise | 02.12.2002 | 22.04.2003 | formand |
Ole Bonde Larsen | 23.08.1994 | 02.12.2002 | bestyrelse |
Niels Jørgen Solmer Frank | 23.08.1994 | 02.12.2002 | formand |