Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Martin Lillie Andersen | 01.11.2007 | 14.02.2011 | direktion |
John Kristian Andersen | 15.11.2001 | 01.11.2007 | direktion |
Martin Lillie Andersen | 30.06.1999 | 15.11.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Lillie Andersen | 17.11.2009 | 14.02.2011 | bestyrelse |
Annemette Andersen | 01.11.2007 | 17.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Bibbi Edith Hyldahl | 30.11.1999 | 14.02.2011 | bestyrelse |
Martin Lillie Andersen | 30.06.1999 | 14.02.2011 | bestyrelse |
John Kristian Andersen | 30.06.1999 | 01.11.2007 | bestyrelse |
Lise-Lotte Lillie Andersen | 30.06.1999 | 30.11.1999 | bestyrelse |