Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carl Peter Lauridsen | 31.03.1999 | 22.12.2006 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Holger Ingolf Lindebjerg Pedersen | 01.06.2006 | 22.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Knud Kierkegaard | 21.05.2003 | 22.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Ida Josepsson Stabell Norre | 01.06.2002 | 22.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Lone Nielsen | 01.06.2002 | 22.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Erik Klaus Olsen | 01.06.2002 | 01.06.2006 | bestyrelse |
Anders Juul Davidsen | 01.01.2000 | 22.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Erik Møller | 31.03.1999 | 22.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Henning Tellerup | 31.03.1999 | 22.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Jytte Heglund | 31.03.1999 | 22.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Michael Larsen | 31.03.1999 | 22.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Niels Jørgensen | 31.03.1999 | 01.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Claus Jens Paulsen | 31.03.1999 | 01.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Arly Johannesen | 31.03.1999 | 01.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Lisbeth Hauch Enevoldsen | 31.03.1999 | 01.06.2002 | bestyrelse |