Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Hansen | 19.03.1998 | 23.08.2011 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Hansen | 12.05.2004 | 23.08.2011 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Philipsen | 12.03.2002 | 12.05.2004 | bestyrelse |
Erik Nielsen | 12.03.2002 | 11.04.2002 | bestyrelse |
Lisbeth Helene Hansen | 19.03.1998 | 23.08.2011 | bestyrelse |
Malene Ottosen | 19.03.1998 | 23.08.2011 | formand |
Mogens Hansen | 19.03.1998 | 12.03.2002 | bestyrelse |