Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jacob Lund | 24.03.2000 | 14.08.2014 | direktion |
Troels Bredahl | 24.06.1998 | 24.03.2000 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.03.1998 | 24.06.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Korgaard Henriksen | 15.05.2013 | 14.08.2014 | bestyrelse |
Morten Lund | 20.02.2008 | 14.08.2014 | bestyrelse |
Jakob í Hjøllum Nielsen | 12.11.2007 | 14.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Abel | 07.05.2007 | 14.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Poul Erik Søndergaard Bendtsen | 25.06.2002 | 07.05.2007 | bestyrelse |
Erik Skifter Andersen | 24.03.2000 | 20.02.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Knudsen | 15.04.1999 | 14.08.2014 | formand |
Jacob Lund | 24.06.1998 | 14.08.2014 | bestyrelse |
Troels Bredahl | 24.06.1998 | 08.07.2004 | bestyrelse |
Else Marie Lund | 24.06.1998 | 24.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.03.1998 | 24.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Lone Mai Henriksen | 01.03.1998 | 24.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Stephan Muurholm | 01.03.1998 | 24.06.1998 | formand |