Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Nørballe Mikkelsen | 26.10.2007 | 05.04.2011 | adm. dir |
Carsten Janus Andersen | 20.11.1997 | 26.10.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Nørballe Mikkelsen | 26.10.2007 | 05.04.2011 | bestyrelse |
Christian Nicholas Rosenkrantz Stadil | 30.11.2000 | 05.04.2011 | bestyrelse |
Thor Stadil | 20.11.1997 | 05.04.2011 | formand |
Carsten Janus Andersen | 20.11.1997 | 26.10.2007 | bestyrelse |
Christian Richard Charles Dahlager | 20.11.1997 | 03.07.2000 | bestyrelse |