Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Nils Rasmus Hansen | 27.06.1997 | 20.12.2010 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.02.1997 | 27.06.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Bech Hansen | 28.11.2006 | 20.12.2010 | bestyrelse |
Bente Hansen | 27.06.1997 | 20.12.2010 | bestyrelse |
Nils Rasmus Hansen | 27.06.1997 | 20.12.2010 | bestyrelse |
Niels Gade | 27.06.1997 | 01.02.1998 | bestyrelse |