Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Flemming Birger Mogensen | 05.10.2007 | 18.08.2017 | direktion |
Klaus Bo Madsen | 05.10.2007 | 04.11.2011 | direktion |
Vilhelm Rise Kristoffersen | 28.07.1997 | 05.10.2007 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 15.01.1997 | 28.07.1997 | direktion |