Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Bjørn Mirazov Jensen | 01.09.1995 | 18.06.2003 | direktion |
Michael Steen Holmbech Schulstad | 01.09.1995 | 15.09.1998 | direktion |
Henning Hansen | 03.07.1995 | 01.09.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Hansen | 03.07.1995 | 01.09.1995 | bestyrelse |
Tyge Jesper Rothe | 03.07.1995 | 01.09.1995 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Gaarden | 03.07.1995 | 01.09.1995 | formand |