Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Timmermann | 01.03.1984 | 01.11.1994 | direktion |
Jørn Bjerre Bojsen | 01.03.1984 | 16.04.1993 | direktion |
Lars Bjørn Hansson | 01.03.1984 | 16.04.1993 | direktion |
Niels Bjørn Hansson | 01.03.1984 | 16.04.1993 | direktion |
Jørgen Larsen | 01.03.1984 | 23.10.1990 | direktion |
Hugo Bjørn Hansson | 01.03.1984 | 23.10.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bjarne Svensson | 01.03.1984 | 01.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
John Helge Larsen | 01.03.1984 | 01.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
Lars Bjørn Hansson | 01.03.1984 | 01.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ole Timmermann | 01.03.1984 | 01.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
Niels Bjørn Hansson | 01.03.1984 | 01.11.1994 | bestyrelse |
Gunner Zwisler Larsen | 01.03.1984 | 16.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Villy Møller | 01.03.1984 | 16.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Larsen | 01.03.1984 | 23.10.1990 | bestyrelse |
Hugo Bjørn Hansson | 01.03.1984 | 23.10.1990 | bestyrelse |