Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tai Hang Cheung | 01.11.1993 | 06.12.1998 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1993 | 14.03.1994 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Wai Sun Ku | 22.08.1997 | 21.08.2000 | bestyrelse |
Chuanzhi Liu | 01.11.1993 | 21.08.2000 | bestyrelse |
Tai Hang Cheung | 01.11.1993 | 06.12.1998 | bestyrelse |
Lan Kuen To | 01.11.1993 | 22.08.1997 | bestyrelse |
Lai Yick NG | 01.11.1993 | 22.08.1997 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Galst | 01.11.1993 | 14.03.1994 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1993 | 14.03.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.11.1993 | 14.03.1994 | formand |