Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Joachim Jensen | 23.06.2003 | 31.08.2004 | direktion |
Claus Gordon Nielsen | 01.09.1993 | 23.06.2003 | direktion |
Jakob Mark Thorsen | 01.09.1993 | 30.01.1998 | direktion |
Søren Rudbeck | 01.09.1993 | 04.07.1995 | direktion |
Jan William Holgersen | 01.09.1993 | 25.01.1995 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.09.1993 | 06.09.1994 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Joachim Jensen | 23.06.2003 | 31.08.2004 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Nordam | 07.12.2001 | 31.08.2004 | bestyrelse |
Søren Boe Mortensen | 07.12.2001 | 31.08.2004 | formand |
Claus Gordon Nielsen | 07.12.2001 | 23.06.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jan Hornsberg | 11.12.2000 | 28.11.2001 | bestyrelse |
Bent Knie-Andersen | 01.09.1993 | 06.12.2001 | formand |
Jakob Mark Thorsen | 01.09.1993 | 11.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Rosenberg Stokholm | 01.09.1993 | 27.10.1997 | bestyrelse |