Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ulla Kirsten Bogø | 01.11.2004 | 12.07.2006 | direktion |
Henrik Ståhl | 01.07.2004 | 01.11.2004 | adm. dir |
Tom Stener Froberg | 17.06.1996 | 30.09.2002 | direktion |
Gunnar Berthel Andréen | 17.06.1996 | 17.06.1996 | direktion |
Erik Nielsen | 01.07.1993 | 23.05.1995 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1993 | 28.09.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ulla Kirsten Bogø | 01.11.2004 | 12.07.2006 | bestyrelse |
Christian Ellegaard | 01.11.2004 | 12.07.2006 | bestyrelse |
Roger Dye | 01.07.2004 | 01.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Ståhl | 30.09.2002 | 12.07.2006 | bestyrelse |
Gunnar Berthel Andréen | 17.06.1996 | 01.11.2004 | formand |
Tom Stener Froberg | 17.06.1996 | 30.09.2002 | bestyrelse |
Lisbeth Erlands | 01.07.1993 | 01.07.2004 | bestyrelse |
Hans Kristian Werdelin | 01.07.1993 | 17.06.1996 | formand |
Gunnar Berthel Andréen | 01.07.1993 | 23.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Galst | 01.07.1993 | 28.09.1993 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1993 | 28.09.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.07.1993 | 28.09.1993 | formand |