Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Dalskov | 03.01.2005 | 29.06.2009 | adm. dir |
Bo Weisel Jensen | 12.12.2002 | 03.01.2005 | direktion |
Henrik Ramlau-Hansen | 12.12.2002 | 12.12.2002 | direktion |
Mogens Jørgensen | 23.02.1996 | 09.03.2000 | direktion |
Troels Christian Gunnergaard | 07.06.1991 | 23.02.1996 | direktion |
Jens Erik Jepsen Christensen | 07.06.1991 | 27.07.1993 | direktion |
Jens Erik Jepsen Christensen | 07.06.1991 | 04.12.1992 | direktion |
Troels Bjerre | 07.06.1991 | 18.11.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Janne Dyrlev | 12.09.2007 | 29.06.2009 | næstformand |
Jens Dalskov | 03.01.2005 | 29.06.2009 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Ramlau-Hansen | 12.12.2002 | 29.06.2009 | formand |
Bo Weisel Jensen | 12.12.2002 | 03.01.2005 | bestyrelse |
Inge Beicher | 11.02.2002 | 12.09.2007 | næstformand |
Olav Wilhelm Ånerud | 01.12.2000 | 12.12.2002 | formand |
Jesper Honore Winkelmann | 01.12.2000 | 11.02.2002 | næstformand |
Ulla Plesner | 01.12.2000 | 01.12.2000 | bestyrelse |
Sven Erik Lystbæk | 23.08.1999 | 09.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Jørgensen | 23.02.1996 | 09.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Erik Bonnerup | 07.06.1991 | 09.03.2000 | formand |
Holger Foged | 07.06.1991 | 03.07.1995 | bestyrelse |
Hans Ejvind Hansen | 07.06.1991 | 03.07.1995 | formand |
Michael Pram Rasmussen | 07.06.1991 | 01.10.1994 | bestyrelse |
Jens Erik Jepsen Christensen | 07.06.1991 | 27.07.1993 | bestyrelse |
Birger Hvirring Larsen | 07.06.1991 | 27.07.1993 | næstformand |
Jens Erik Jepsen Christensen | 07.06.1991 | 04.12.1992 | bestyrelse |
Erik Bonnerup | 07.06.1991 | 04.12.1992 | formand |
Birger Hvirring Larsen | 07.06.1991 | 04.12.1992 | næstformand |
Troels Bjerre | 07.06.1991 | 18.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Peter Melchior | 07.06.1991 | 25.02.1992 | bestyrelse |