Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Karin Louise Mohnsen | 01.03.1993 | 22.11.2000 | direktion |
Per Merfeldt | 01.03.1993 | 27.06.1996 | direktion |
Karin Louise Mohnsen | 01.03.1993 | 28.04.1995 | direktion |
Reimer Mohnsen | 01.03.1993 | 28.04.1995 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.03.1993 | 04.10.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Karin Louise Mohnsen | 01.03.1993 | 22.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Reimer Mohnsen | 01.03.1993 | 22.11.2000 | formand |
Jesper Laage Kjeldsen | 01.03.1993 | 18.06.1999 | bestyrelse |