Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Benny Møller | 09.09.1980 | 15.05.1996 | direktion |
Bent Anker Villumsen | 09.09.1980 | 14.03.1994 | direktion |
Henning Vestergaard Bodilsen | 09.09.1980 | 20.01.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørn Ankær Thomsen | 09.09.1980 | 15.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Henning Vestergaard Bodilsen | 09.09.1980 | 15.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Ruth Foged Bodilsen | 09.09.1980 | 15.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Ebbe Simonsen | 09.09.1980 | 15.05.1996 | bestyrelse |
Erik Toft Bodilsen | 09.09.1980 | 20.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Henning Vestergaard Bodilsen | 09.09.1980 | 13.12.1989 | bestyrelse |