Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Birgit Meise | 30.09.1998 | 24.09.2002 | direktion |
Michael Mathiesen | 30.09.1998 | 23.04.1999 | direktion |
Lene Helbo | 08.10.1997 | 30.09.1998 | direktion |
Birgit Larsen | 01.09.1992 | 08.10.1997 | direktion |
Søren Krambeck Nielsen | 01.09.1992 | 26.01.1995 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.09.1992 | 22.04.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Birgit Meise | 17.03.2000 | 24.09.2002 | bestyrelse |
Hans Ole Larsen | 17.03.2000 | 24.09.2002 | bestyrelse |
Michael Mathiesen | 30.09.1998 | 24.09.2002 | formand |
Lene Helbo | 26.05.1998 | 30.09.1998 | bestyrelse |
Steen Villemoes | 01.09.1992 | 17.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Søren Krambeck Nielsen | 01.09.1992 | 17.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Birgit Larsen | 01.09.1992 | 30.09.1998 | bestyrelse |
Ole Gjerløv | 01.09.1992 | 26.05.1998 | formand |
Paul Brüniche-Olsen | 01.09.1992 | 26.01.1995 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.09.1992 | 22.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Asbjørn Christoffersen | 01.09.1992 | 22.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Sebastian Benjamin Bahn Christoffersen | 01.09.1992 | 22.04.1993 | bestyrelse |