Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Tauby Sørensen | 25.09.1997 | 01.10.1998 | direktion |
Carsten Brebøl | 01.06.1992 | 25.09.1997 | direktion |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.06.1992 | 11.01.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Tauby Sørensen | 25.09.1997 | 01.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Bo Carl Dall | 01.06.1992 | 01.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Graeis Lillian Pedersen | 01.06.1992 | 01.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Brebøl | 01.06.1992 | 25.09.1997 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.06.1992 | 11.01.1993 | bestyrelse |