Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ernst Genckel | 01.08.1991 | 19.09.1996 | direktion |
Preben Bang Henriksen | 01.08.1991 | 19.02.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Sonne Sørensen | 31.05.1995 | 19.09.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jens Arnth-Jensen | 31.05.1995 | 19.09.1996 | bestyrelse |
Hans Werner Fugmann | 31.05.1995 | 19.09.1996 | bestyrelse |