Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lund Hjøllund Jensen | 01.11.1990 | 22.05.2000 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.11.1990 | 25.09.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Lund | 17.11.1995 | 11.05.1998 | bestyrelse |
Poul Schack Petersen | 01.11.1990 | 29.08.2000 | formand |
Lund Hjøllund Jensen | 01.11.1990 | 22.05.2000 | bestyrelse |
Frans Thomas Rybka | 01.11.1990 | 17.11.1995 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1990 | 25.09.1991 | bestyrelse |