Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Lorensen | 01.07.1991 | 02.10.1995 | direktion |
Bent Georg Nielsen | 01.07.1991 | 16.03.1992 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1991 | 21.01.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kristian Lund Kristensen | 01.07.1991 | 02.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Theodor Benned Hansen | 01.07.1991 | 02.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Poul Georg Sørensen | 01.07.1991 | 02.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Johann Johannsson | 01.07.1991 | 02.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Michael Christian Torben Serring | 01.07.1991 | 02.10.1995 | suppleant |
Helge Samuel Andersen | 01.07.1991 | 02.10.1995 | formand |
Aage Bech | 01.07.1991 | 16.03.1992 | bestyrelse |
Hans Aage Lund | 01.07.1991 | 16.03.1992 | bestyrelse |
John Emil Pedersen | 01.07.1991 | 16.03.1992 | formand |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.07.1991 | 21.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.07.1991 | 21.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.07.1991 | 21.01.1992 | formand |