Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens-Erik Holm | 11.10.1994 | 12.04.2002 | direktion |
Carl Jørgen Holm | 11.10.1994 | 19.12.1997 | direktion |
Frede Orla Holm | 01.04.1991 | 11.10.1994 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1991 | 21.11.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Hvidt | 11.10.1994 | 30.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Jacob Halgaard | 11.10.1994 | 30.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Jens-Erik Holm | 01.04.1991 | 12.04.2002 | bestyrelse |
Carl Jørgen Holm | 01.04.1991 | 12.04.2002 | bestyrelse |
Frede Orla Holm | 01.04.1991 | 12.04.2002 | bestyrelse |
Ruth Udengaard Holm | 01.04.1991 | 11.10.1994 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.04.1991 | 21.11.1991 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1991 | 21.11.1991 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.04.1991 | 21.11.1991 | formand |