Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Flemming Damborg Pedersen | 01.04.1991 | 20.11.1996 | direktion |
Tanja Kirstina Helen Marguerite Noyons | 01.04.1991 | 25.08.1993 | direktion |
Betina Christina Klem Wennike | 01.04.1991 | 03.12.1991 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1991 | 16.07.1991 | direktion |