Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ib Larsen | 29.01.1991 | 06.06.1996 | direktion |
Karsten Normann Larsen | 29.01.1991 | 06.06.1996 | direktion |
Stefan Ralph Mogens Littauer | 29.01.1991 | 08.09.1993 | direktion |
Winnie Karina Normann | 29.01.1991 | 08.09.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Normann | 29.01.1991 | 06.06.1996 | bestyrelse |
Ib Larsen | 29.01.1991 | 06.06.1996 | bestyrelse |
Karsten Normann Larsen | 29.01.1991 | 06.06.1996 | bestyrelse |
Winnie Karina Normann | 29.01.1991 | 08.09.1993 | bestyrelse |
Stefan Ralph Mogens Littauer | 29.01.1991 | 14.10.1991 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Maks Littauer | 29.01.1991 | 14.10.1991 | formand |