Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Casper Winther | 07.12.1992 | 09.08.2001 | direktion |
Mogens Winther | 01.11.1990 | 07.12.1992 | direktion |
Lars Hougaard Bak | 01.11.1990 | 07.10.1992 | direktion |
Sine Merete Thomsen | 01.11.1990 | 07.10.1992 | direktion |
Dennis Thomsen | 01.11.1990 | 10.10.1991 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.11.1990 | 21.05.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kirsten Winther | 01.11.1990 | 24.04.1995 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Winther | 01.11.1990 | 07.12.1992 | bestyrelse |
Lars Hougaard Bak | 01.11.1990 | 07.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Sine Merete Thomsen | 01.11.1990 | 07.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
John Pedersen Beiskjær | 01.11.1990 | 07.10.1992 | formand |
Dennis Thomsen | 01.11.1990 | 10.10.1991 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1990 | 21.05.1991 | bestyrelse |