Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Alexander Michael Schaumann | 01.01.1990 | 26.11.1992 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.01.1990 | 27.07.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Erik Jepsen Christensen | 01.01.1990 | 26.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Troels Bjerre | 01.01.1990 | 26.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Erik Bonnerup | 01.01.1990 | 26.11.1992 | formand |
Peter Melchior | 01.01.1990 | 26.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Jan Evald Pedersen | 01.01.1990 | 26.07.1991 | bestyrelse |
Alexander Michael Schaumann | 01.01.1990 | 26.07.1991 | bestyrelse |
Anders Hjorth | 01.01.1990 | 26.07.1991 | formand |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.01.1990 | 27.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.01.1990 | 27.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.01.1990 | 27.07.1990 | formand |