Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Stein Rugtveit | 01.12.1989 | 03.07.2013 | direktion |
Anne-Lise Becker | 01.12.1989 | 01.04.1996 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.12.1989 | 07.06.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jeanette Matzau | 30.01.1997 | 03.07.2013 | formand |
Stein Rugtveit | 01.12.1989 | 03.07.2013 | bestyrelse |
Anne-Lise Becker | 01.12.1989 | 01.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Stein Rugtveit | 01.12.1989 | 01.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.12.1989 | 07.06.1990 | bestyrelse |