Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Birger Halfdan Stenby | 01.11.1989 | 09.04.1996 | direktion |
Poul Birkegaard Nielsen | 01.11.1989 | 17.02.1992 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1989 | 08.06.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bente Sepstrup Stenby | 01.11.1989 | 09.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Lillian Britha Stenby | 01.11.1989 | 09.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Poul Birkegaard Nielsen | 01.11.1989 | 09.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Hans Henrik Leschly | 01.11.1989 | 09.04.1996 | formand |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.11.1989 | 08.06.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.11.1989 | 08.06.1990 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.11.1989 | 08.06.1990 | formand |