Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bruno Harke Giørtz | 01.10.1989 | 25.02.1997 | direktion |
Søren Giørtz | 01.10.1989 | 30.06.1995 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1989 | 27.02.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Søren Giørtz | 01.10.1989 | 25.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Bruno Harke Giørtz | 01.10.1989 | 25.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Carla Giørtz | 01.10.1989 | 25.02.1997 | bestyrelse |
Jette Winberg Giørtz | 01.10.1989 | 19.07.1995 | bestyrelse |
Søren Giørtz | 01.10.1989 | 30.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Hanne Vistesen | 01.10.1989 | 30.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.10.1989 | 27.02.1990 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1989 | 27.02.1990 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.10.1989 | 27.02.1990 | formand |