Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Brian Lund Johansen | 01.08.1989 | 15.04.1996 | direktion |
Frank Hakon Christensen | 01.08.1989 | 03.02.1994 | direktion |
Hans Jørgen Kurt Mathias | 01.08.1989 | 09.09.1992 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1989 | 27.12.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Brian Lund Johansen | 01.08.1989 | 15.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Mikael Staffeldt | 01.08.1989 | 15.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Hans Jørgen Kurt Mathias | 01.08.1989 | 15.04.1996 | formand |
Frank Hakon Christensen | 01.08.1989 | 03.02.1994 | bestyrelse |
Anne Stenild | 01.08.1989 | 03.02.1994 | formand |
Ingolf Palle Vindahl Hansen | 01.08.1989 | 09.09.1992 | bestyrelse |
John Buchanan Lademann | 01.08.1989 | 06.02.1992 | formand |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.08.1989 | 27.12.1989 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1989 | 27.12.1989 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.08.1989 | 27.12.1989 | formand |