Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Møller | 01.06.1989 | 01.10.1997 | direktion |
Niels Nielsen | 01.06.1989 | 29.11.1994 | direktion |
Knud Erik Tranborg | 01.06.1989 | 25.08.1994 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.06.1989 | 04.01.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Møller | 01.06.1989 | 01.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Knud Erik Hansen | 01.06.1989 | 01.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Heinrich Schou Nielsen | 01.06.1989 | 01.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Peter Sørensen | 01.06.1989 | 01.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Herdis Kjeldsen Tranborg | 01.06.1989 | 25.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Gunhild Kjeldsen Jensen | 01.06.1989 | 25.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.06.1989 | 04.01.1990 | bestyrelse |