Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Boisen Juhl | 01.05.1989 | 07.04.1995 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1989 | 06.10.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Karen Henriette Grønning Juhl | 01.05.1989 | 07.04.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Boisen Juhl | 01.05.1989 | 07.04.1995 | bestyrelse |
Rene Johansen | 01.05.1989 | 07.04.1995 | formand |
Henrik Øregaard Dam | 01.05.1989 | 13.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Jens Jørgen Pedersen | 01.05.1989 | 03.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Balch Christensen | 01.05.1989 | 03.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Finn Strier Poulsen | 01.05.1989 | 03.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Svend Erik Kracht | 01.05.1989 | 03.05.1991 | formand |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.05.1989 | 06.10.1989 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1989 | 06.10.1989 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.05.1989 | 06.10.1989 | formand |