Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Eigil Herms | 01.04.1989 | 04.02.1991 | direktion |
Lorenzo Alcina Riera | 01.04.1989 | 02.07.1990 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1989 | 22.08.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Eigil Herms | 01.04.1989 | 04.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Martin von Huth Smith | 01.04.1989 | 04.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Hans Magnus Kolby Hansen | 01.04.1989 | 04.02.1991 | formand |
Lisbeth Sonja Søbøtker | 01.04.1989 | 02.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Marianne Jensen | 01.04.1989 | 02.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Levi Jensen | 01.04.1989 | 02.07.1990 | formand |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.04.1989 | 22.08.1989 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1989 | 22.08.1989 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.04.1989 | 22.08.1989 | formand |