Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars-Erik Svantesson | 08.12.1997 | 18.04.2001 | direktion |
Mads Verner Jørgensen | 01.04.1989 | 08.12.1997 | direktion |
Anne-Grete Monefeldt | 01.04.1989 | 17.05.1996 | direktion |
Tom Parlow | 01.04.1989 | 22.08.1995 | direktion |
Bent Laybourn | 01.04.1989 | 30.01.1991 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.04.1989 | 01.09.1989 | direktion |