Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Richard Charles Dahlager | 10.11.1988 | 05.11.1996 | direktion |
Lisa Margo Carew Dahlager | 10.11.1988 | 24.05.1994 | direktion |
Nanna Norup Svensson | 10.11.1988 | 10.09.1990 | direktion |
Aboubakr Ibrahim Mostafa Eid | 10.11.1988 | 10.07.1990 | direktion |
Thor Stadil | 10.11.1988 | 10.05.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Hansen | 10.11.1988 | 10.05.1989 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Gaarden | 10.11.1988 | 10.05.1989 | bestyrelse |
Tyge Jesper Rothe | 10.11.1988 | 10.05.1989 | bestyrelse |