Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Søren Christian Larsen | 01.11.1988 | 25.08.1998 | direktion |
Johannes Clausager Dalgaard | 01.11.1988 | 08.05.1992 | direktion |
Dan Børge Larsen | 01.11.1988 | 16.07.1990 | direktion |
Viggo Dresing | 01.11.1988 | 06.04.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Søren Christian Larsen | 01.11.1988 | 25.08.1998 | bestyrelse |
Jon Steen Petersen | 01.11.1988 | 25.08.1998 | bestyrelse |
Helge Bjerregaard | 01.11.1988 | 25.08.1998 | bestyrelse |
Hans-Jørgen Lütz Kalodent Kruse | 01.11.1988 | 24.01.1990 | bestyrelse |