Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Christensen | 01.10.1988 | 18.11.2014 | direktion |
Peder Fredskild | 01.10.1988 | 21.12.1992 | direktion |
Martin Rud Lauridsen | 01.10.1988 | 03.03.1992 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1988 | 28.03.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Peter Agerskov Larsen | 17.08.2011 | 18.11.2014 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Jellum | 26.05.2008 | 18.11.2014 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Frøhlich | 26.05.2008 | 18.03.2013 | formand |
Iben Lindhardt Olsson | 29.05.2002 | 26.05.2008 | bestyrelse |
Lisbeth Erholm Olsen | 08.03.2000 | 07.07.2011 | bestyrelse |
Steen Holm Simonsen | 03.04.1998 | 13.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
David Junge | 11.12.1996 | 08.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Ole Bang Nielsen | 20.06.1996 | 30.09.2007 | formand |
Morten Krarup | 06.04.1995 | 29.05.2002 | formand |
Kurt Christensen | 22.03.1993 | 18.11.2014 | bestyrelse |
Steen Sirian | 01.10.1988 | 21.11.2007 | bestyrelse |
Peder Fredskild | 01.10.1988 | 25.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Martin Rud Lauridsen | 01.10.1988 | 25.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Erling Kjeldsen | 01.10.1988 | 22.03.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ole Bang Nielsen | 01.10.1988 | 21.05.1992 | bestyrelse |
Ulf Svejgaard Poulsen | 01.10.1988 | 28.03.1989 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1988 | 28.03.1989 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.10.1988 | 28.03.1989 | formand |