Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jette Svinth Kristensen | 06.11.2003 | 11.01.2005 | direktion |
Gert Petersen | 01.08.1988 | 06.11.2003 | direktion |
Jette Svinth Kristensen | 01.08.1988 | 12.08.1992 | direktion |
Ulla Ploug | 01.08.1988 | 06.03.1992 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.08.1988 | 23.12.1988 | direktion |