Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Linder Thomsen | 28.12.1999 | 19.08.2019 | direktion |
Jørgen Christensen | 19.08.1988 | 28.12.1999 | direktion |
Lars Henrik Johansen | 19.08.1988 | 03.04.1995 | direktion |
Hans Birch Mogensen | 19.08.1988 | 08.11.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Klaus Lundsgaard | 19.08.1988 | 08.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Charlotte Schaumburg | 19.08.1988 | 08.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Jens Ole Lundsgaard | 19.08.1988 | 08.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Per Lundsgaard | 19.08.1988 | 08.11.1993 | bestyrelse |