Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kent Steen Carlsen | 29.11.2002 | 30.11.2003 | adm. dir |
Erik Pedersen Bruun | 27.09.2024 | 15.04.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Pedersen Bruun | 15.04.2003 | 30.11.2003 | bestyrelse |
Johannes Dag Haugaard | 31.05.2002 | 30.11.2003 | bestyrelse |
Preben Sunke | 28.02.2002 | 30.11.2003 | næstformand |
Jan Hinderfeldt Isager | 24.01.2000 | 31.05.2002 | bestyrelse |
Egil Christensen | 27.09.2024 | 30.11.2003 | formand |
Ove Thejls | 27.09.2024 | 15.04.2003 | næstformand |
Kent Steen Carlsen | 27.09.2024 | 28.02.2002 | bestyrelse |
Bent Maribo | 27.09.2024 | 15.05.2000 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Axel Juul Nordenlund | 27.09.2024 | 24.01.2000 | bestyrelse |
Gert Jørn Kjeldsen | 27.09.2024 | 12.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Per Højgaard Andersen | 27.09.2024 | 24.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Niels Vestergaard Hove Tange | 27.09.2024 | 24.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Niels Gottrup Mikkelsen | 27.09.2024 | 24.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jens Andreas Toft Fensvig | 27.09.2024 | 24.10.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Laursen Vig | 27.09.2024 | 24.10.1996 | formand |
Bent Sloth | 27.09.2024 | 26.04.1996 | formand |
Rasmus Juhl Rasmussen | 27.09.2024 | 27.02.1996 | bestyrelse |
Hakon Michelsen Hansen | 27.09.2024 | 25.10.1995 | bestyrelse |
Gunnar Fink | 27.09.2024 | 20.01.1995 | bestyrelse |
Benny Ravn Bonde | 27.09.2024 | 20.01.1995 | bestyrelse |
Kresten Bonefeld | 27.09.2024 | 28.03.1994 | bestyrelse |
Erik Skovgård Kristensen | 27.09.2024 | 28.03.1994 | næstformand |
Jørgen Laursen Vig | 27.09.2024 | 03.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
Laurids Caspersen Boisen | 27.09.2024 | 03.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Kristen Pedersen | 27.09.2024 | 03.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
Kristian Hess Jensen | 27.09.2024 | 03.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
Bent Claudi Lassen | 27.09.2024 | 03.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
Bent Hjort Knudsen | 27.09.2024 | 03.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
Bent Maribo | 27.09.2024 | 03.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
Egon Kristensen | 27.09.2024 | 03.05.1993 | bestyrelse |
Knud Munk Nielsen | 27.09.2024 | 22.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Niels Rovsing | 27.09.2024 | 12.06.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Kristen Pedersen | 27.09.2024 | 24.01.1991 | bestyrelse |
Peter Riis Jensen | 27.09.2024 | 05.04.1990 | bestyrelse |
Vagn Skovsen | 27.09.2024 | 05.04.1990 | bestyrelse |
Niels Okholm Philipsen | 27.09.2024 | 05.04.1990 | bestyrelse |