Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Freya Selena Petersen | 18.12.1996 | 25.05.1998 | direktion |
Hans Christian Hoeck | 04.08.1988 | 18.12.1996 | direktion |
Hans Isbrandt Gad Johannsen | 04.08.1988 | 19.02.1993 | direktion |
Finn Jørgen Jensen | 04.08.1988 | 19.04.1991 | direktion |
Hanne-Mette Marie Johansen Jensen | 04.08.1988 | 19.04.1991 | direktion |
Haiying Yang | 04.08.1988 | 14.03.1990 | direktion |
Hans Birch Mogensen | 04.08.1988 | 20.04.1989 | direktion |