Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Elo Pedersen | 01.05.1988 | 01.05.1995 | direktion |
Susanne Saul Stakemann | 01.05.1988 | 21.10.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Folmer Søren Olsen | 01.05.1988 | 01.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Erling Ditlev Eriksen | 01.05.1988 | 01.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Elo Pedersen | 01.05.1988 | 01.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Daugaard Hansen | 01.05.1988 | 16.10.1989 | bestyrelse |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.05.1988 | 21.10.1988 | bestyrelse |