Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Svangren | 07.03.1988 | 13.07.1991 | direktion |
Jørgen Henrik Christensen | 07.03.1988 | 01.05.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Svangren | 07.03.1988 | 13.07.1991 | bestyrelse |
Tore Nyvoll | 07.03.1988 | 13.07.1991 | formand |
Karen Marie Henningsen | 07.03.1988 | 08.02.1990 | bestyrelse |
Lennart Forshufvud | 07.03.1988 | 08.02.1990 | bestyrelse |