Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Vagner Bak Iversen | 01.10.1987 | 30.08.1995 | direktion |
Niels Gert Elgaard | 01.10.1987 | 02.09.1993 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.10.1987 | 21.03.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Vagner Bak Iversen | 01.10.1987 | 30.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Bak Iversen | 01.10.1987 | 30.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Bak Iversen | 01.10.1987 | 30.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Christian Morsing | 01.10.1987 | 30.08.1995 | formand |