Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carlo Kristian Pedersen | 01.09.1987 | 23.07.1991 | direktion |
Per Emil Hasselbalch Stakemann | 01.09.1987 | 18.02.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Vagner Simonsen Jensen | 01.09.1987 | 23.07.1991 | bestyrelse |
Henning Juel Jensen | 01.09.1987 | 23.07.1991 | bestyrelse |
Tommy Aagaard Christensen | 01.09.1987 | 23.07.1991 | bestyrelse |
Carlo Kristian Pedersen | 01.09.1987 | 23.07.1991 | bestyrelse |
Hans Johan Jensen | 01.09.1987 | 23.07.1991 | bestyrelse |
Ole Thorup | 01.09.1987 | 23.07.1991 | bestyrelse |
Torben Haldrup | 01.09.1987 | 23.07.1991 | formand |
Torben Bohmann | 01.09.1987 | 25.07.1989 | bestyrelse |