Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anne Bitsch-Larsen | 13.05.1999 | 20.08.2001 | direktion |
Sven Bitsch-Larsen | 16.07.1987 | 27.09.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anne Bitsch-Larsen | 13.05.1999 | 20.08.2001 | bestyrelse |
Lars Peter Jørgensen | 16.07.1987 | 12.04.1994 | bestyrelse |
Sven Bitsch-Larsen | 16.07.1987 | 12.04.1994 | bestyrelse |
Torsten Steenild Wulff | 16.07.1987 | 18.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Hans Jørgen Jacobsen | 16.07.1987 | 18.07.1990 | bestyrelse |