Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erling Pedersen | 01.06.1986 | 23.08.2011 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Juul Jørgensen | 06.11.2009 | 23.08.2011 | bestyrelse |
Michael Roschmann Skovgaard | 06.11.2009 | 17.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Jens Okholm | 10.11.2006 | 23.08.2011 | formand |
Flemming Dyppel | 10.11.2006 | 08.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Dorte Pedersen | 03.03.2003 | 23.08.2011 | bestyrelse |
Gitte Kirkegaard | 03.03.2003 | 23.08.2011 | bestyrelse |
Brian Jacobsen | 03.03.2003 | 23.08.2011 | bestyrelse |
Erling Pedersen | 03.03.2003 | 06.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Jens Okholm | 03.03.2003 | 03.11.2004 | formand |