Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carl Erik Skovgaard | 03.01.2018 | 10.10.2018 | direktør |
Preben Mikkelsen | 10.05.1968 | 03.01.2018 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carl Erik Skovgaard | 03.01.2018 | 10.10.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Birgitte Hvolby | 03.01.2018 | 10.10.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Peter Jakobsen | 03.01.2018 | 10.10.2018 | formand |
Dorthe Elisa Kjeldsen | 18.12.2012 | 03.01.2018 | bestyrelse |
Birthe Johnsen | 18.05.2000 | 18.12.2012 | bestyrelse |
Gitte Gottlob | 30.11.1997 | 18.05.2000 | bestyrelse |
Preben Mikkelsen | 10.05.1968 | 03.01.2018 | bestyrelse |
Tove Solveig Jakobsen | 10.05.1968 | 03.01.2018 | bestyrelse |
Gudrun Ottilia Mikkelsen | 10.05.1968 | 03.11.1997 | bestyrelse |